AR HB1513 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Notification that HB1513 is now Act 841
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Notification that HB1513 is now Act 841
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create An Income Tax Credit For Retired Law Enforcement Officers Who Work Cold Cases For The Division Of Arkansas State Police.
Title
To Create An Income Tax Credit For Retired Law Enforcement Officers Who Work Cold Cases For The Division Of Arkansas State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1513 is now Act 841 |
2021-04-21 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-20 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-11 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |