AR HB1512 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Reduce The Income Tax Rates Applicable To Individuals, Trusts, And Estates Using Revenues Derived From Sales And Use Tax From Sellers That Do Not Have A Physical Presence In The State; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Reduce The Income Tax Rates Applicable To Individuals, Trusts, And Estates Using Revenues Derived From Sales And Use Tax From Sellers That Do Not Have A Physical Presence In The State; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2017-02-23HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-23HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-23HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2017-02-10HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback