AR HB1510 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that HB1510 is now Act 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that HB1510 is now Act 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require A School District Board Of Directors And Local Law Enforcement Agency To Adopt A Memorandum Of Understanding Governing School Resource Officers; And To Require School Resource Officers Complete Specialized Training.
Title
To Require A School District Board Of Directors And Local Law Enforcement Agency To Adopt A Memorandum Of Understanding Governing School Resource Officers; And To Require School Resource Officers Complete Specialized Training.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Scott [D] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Rep. Lee Johnson [R] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] |
Rep. Keith Slape [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1510 is now Act 622 |
2021-04-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |