AR HB1509 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1509 is now Act 755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Use Of Higher Education Funds; To Amend The Law Concerning Private Resident And Correspondence Schools; And To Amend The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship Eligibility Requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Use Of Higher Education Funds; To Amend The Law Concerning Private Resident And Correspondence Schools; And To Amend The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship Eligibility Requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseNotification that HB1509 is now Act 755
2019-04-03HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-02HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-02SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-25SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2019-03-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback