AR HB1508 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB1508 is now Act 1500
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Enact The Arkansas Health Insurance Marketplace Act; To Promote Competition Among Health Insurance Carriers; To Decrease The Cost Of Health Insurance; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Enact The Arkansas Health Insurance Marketplace Act; To Promote Competition Among Health Insurance Carriers; To Decrease The Cost Of Health Insurance; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23HouseNotification that HB1508 is now Act 1500
2013-04-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-18HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-18HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2013-04-18SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2013-04-18SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2013-04-16SenateReceived from the House.
2013-04-16HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-16HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-16HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-16HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-15HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2013-04-12HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-12HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-12HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-02-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2013-02-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback