AR HB1502 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that HB1502 is now Act 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require That Clear Face Mask Coverings Be Worn By Certain Persons If Interacting With An Individual Who Is Deaf Or Hard Of Hearing During Certain Disaster Emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require That Clear Face Mask Coverings Be Worn By Certain Persons If Interacting With An Individual Who Is Deaf Or Hard Of Hearing During Certain Disaster Emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseNotification that HB1502 is now Act 697
2021-04-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-06HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-06HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-06SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-10SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-10SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback