AR HB1500 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Notification that HB1500 is now Act 599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Acts 2003, No. 1366, As Amended, The Homeland Security Information Act; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Acts 2003, No. 1366, As Amended, The Homeland Security Information Act; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseNotification that HB1500 is now Act 599
2019-03-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-27HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-27SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-27SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-25SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-25HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-02-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-21HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback