AR HB1498 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1498 is now Act 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1498 is now Act 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Agriculture Department - Capital Projects General Improvement Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Agriculture Department - Capital Projects General Improvement Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Notification that HB1498 is now Act 485 |
2017-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-06 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-24 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-24 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-15 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2017-02-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |