AR HB1495 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 91-22)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Load Limits For A Vehicle Transporting Certain Raw Materials And Logs; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Load Limits For A Vehicle Transporting Certain Raw Materials And Logs; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors

Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R]Sen. Ben Gilmore [R]Rep. Richard Womack [R]Rep. Fred Allen [D]
Rep. Sonia Eubanks Barker [R]Rep. Howard Beaty [R]Rep. Rick Beck [R]Rep. Mary Bentley [R]
Rep. Mark Berry [R]Rep. Stan Berry [R]Rep. Justin Boyd [R]Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R]
Rep. Harlan Breaux [R]Rep. Keith Brooks [R]Rep. Karilyn Brown [R]Rep. John Carr [R]
Rep. Frances Cavenaugh [R]Rep. Joe Cloud [R]Rep. Nicole Clowney [D]Rep. Bruce Coleman [R]
Rep. Andrew Collins [D]Rep. Cameron Cooper [R]Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]Rep. Cindy Crawford [R]
Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Marsh Davis [R]Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R]Rep. Jim Dotson [R]
Rep. Les Eaves [R]Rep. Jon Eubanks [R]Rep. Brian Evans [R]Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D]
Rep. Ken Ferguson [D]Rep. David Fielding [D]Rep. Charlene Fite [R]Rep. Lanny Fite [R]
Rep. Vivian Flowers [D]Rep. Jack Fortner [R]Rep. Tony Furman [R]Rep. Denise Garner [D]
Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R]Rep. Megan Godfrey [D]Rep. Justin Gonzales [R]Rep. Michelle Gray [R]
Rep. Delia Haak [R]Rep. Spencer Hawks [R]Rep. David Hillman [R]Rep. Monte Hodges [D]
Rep. Mike Holcomb [R]Rep. Steve Hollowell [R]Rep. Ashley Hudson [D]Rep. Lane Jean [R]
Rep. Logan Jett [R]Rep. Lee Johnson [R]Rep. Jack Ladyman [R]Rep. Frederick Love [D]
Rep. Mark Lowery [R]Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]Rep. Roger Lynch [R]Rep. John Maddox [R]
Rep. Rick McClure [R]Rep. Austin Mccollum [R]Rep. Tippi McCullough [D]Rep. Mark McElroy [R]
Rep. Richard McGrew [R]Rep. Gayla McKenzie [R]Rep. Ron Mcnair [R]Rep. Stephen Meeks [R]
Rep. Josh Miller [R]Rep. Jon Milligan [R]Rep. Reginald Murdock [D]Rep. Milton Nicks [D]
Rep. John Payton [R]Rep. Mark Perry [D]Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R]Rep. David Ray [R]
Rep. Jay Richardson [D]Rep. Marcus Richmond [R]Rep. Johnny Rye [R]Rep. Jamie Scott [D]
Rep. Keith Slape [R]Rep. Brandt Smith [R]Rep. Stu Smith [R]Rep. Nelda Speaks [R]
Rep. Joy Springer [D]Rep. David Tollett [R]Rep. Kendon Underwood [R]Rep. Deann Vaught [R]
Rep. Les Warren [R]Rep. Danny Watson [R]Rep. David Whitaker [D]Rep. Carlton Wing [R]
Rep. Jim Wooten [R]Sen. Bob Ballinger [R]Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]Sen. Alan Clark [R]
Sen. Breanne Davis [R]Sen. Lance Eads [R]Sen. Scott Flippo [R]Sen. Trent Garner [R]
Sen. Kim Hammer [R]Sen. Bart Hester [R]Sen. Ricky Hill [R]Sen. Missy Irvin [R]
Sen. Blake Johnson [R]Sen. Mark Johnson [R]Sen. Greg Leding [D]Sen. Jason Rapert [R]
Sen. Terry Rice [R]Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. Clarke Tucker [D]
Sen. David Wallace [R]

Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 29 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2021-04-21HouseThe vote by which HB1495 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2021-04-21HouseMotion to expunge vote passed
2021-04-20HouseRead the third time and failed.
2021-04-20HouseThe vote by which HB1495 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2021-04-20HouseMotion to expunge the vote passed
2021-04-20HouseRead the third time and failed.
2021-02-23HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2021-02-10HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback