AR HB1492 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Notification that HB1492 is now Act 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Election Pages; And To Allow Certain High School Students To Perform The Duties And Functions Of Election Officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Election Pages; And To Allow Certain High School Students To Perform The Duties And Functions Of Election Officials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseNotification that HB1492 is now Act 328
2019-03-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-04HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-04HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-04SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-25SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback