AR HB1486 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that HB1486 is now Act 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that HB1486 is now Act 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Distracted Driving; And To Create Ashton's And Abbie's Law.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Distracted Driving; And To Create Ashton's And Abbie's Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1486 is now Act 445 |
2023-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-29 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2023-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2023-03-13 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2023-03-13 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |