AR HB1485 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1485 is now Act 808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Notification that HB1485 is now Act 808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Issuance Of Special License Plates For National Historic Sites In Arkansas; And To Create The Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Special License Plate.
Title
To Authorize The Issuance Of Special License Plates For National Historic Sites In Arkansas; And To Create The Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Special License Plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Notification that HB1485 is now Act 808 |
2023-04-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Motion to expunge the vote by which HB1485 failed. Motion Carried. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |