AR HB1485 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1485 is now Act 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1485 is now Act 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 25 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning State Government.
Title
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 25 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning State Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1485 is now Act 307 |
2017-02-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-22 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |