AR HB1480 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Notification that HB1480 is now Act 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Notification that HB1480 is now Act 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Cabinet-level Department Secretaries; And To Require The Secretary Of A Cabinet-level Department To Provide A Report To The Legislative Council.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Cabinet-level Department Secretaries; And To Require The Secretary Of A Cabinet-level Department To Provide A Report To The Legislative Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Berry [R] | Sen. Charles Beckham [R] | Rep. Richard McGrew [R] | Rep. Keith Slape [R] |
Rep. Brandt Smith [R] | Rep. Danny Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Notification that HB1480 is now Act 413 |
2021-03-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-15 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-03 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |