AR HB1475 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Appointment Of Guardians By Establishing A Bill Of Rights For Wards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Appointment Of Guardians By Establishing A Bill Of Rights For Wards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseDied in the House at Sine Die
2017-03-27HouseRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-23HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-23HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-23HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-22HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2017-02-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-02-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback