AR HB1475 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide Statutory Guidance Concerning Interstate Conventions Under Article V Of The United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide Statutory Guidance Concerning Interstate Conventions Under Article V Of The United States Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22HouseDied in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-04-22SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-03-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2015-03-09SenateReceived from the House.
2015-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-04HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2015-02-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback