AR HB1475 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1475 is now Act 473
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize The Issuance Of A Disabled Veteran Special Motorcycle License Plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize The Issuance Of A Disabled Veteran Special Motorcycle License Plate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21HouseNotification that HB1475 is now Act 473
2013-03-20HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-03-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-03-19HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2013-03-19SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2013-03-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-18SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
2013-03-04SenateReceived from the House.
2013-03-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-01HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-02-28HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-02-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2013-02-25HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback