AR HB1472 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that HB1472 is now Act 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that HB1472 is now Act 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Arkansas School For Mathematics, Sciences, And The Arts; To Amend The Composition Of The Ex Officio Members Serving On The Board Of Visitors; And To Amend Eligibility Requirements For Instructors.
Title
Concerning The Arkansas School For Mathematics, Sciences, And The Arts; To Amend The Composition Of The Ex Officio Members Serving On The Board Of Visitors; And To Amend Eligibility Requirements For Instructors.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Rep. Richard McGrew [R] | Rep. Les Warren [R] |
Sen. Greg Leding [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Notification that HB1472 is now Act 354 |
2021-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |