AR HB1470 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1470 is now Act 1340
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1470 is now Act 1340
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish Pre-adjudication Probation Programs.
Title
To Establish Pre-adjudication Probation Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Notification that HB1470 is now Act 1340 |
2013-04-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-16 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2013-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed |