AR HB1469 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Notification that HB1469 is now Act 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Definition Of "foster Home" Under The Child Welfare Agency Licensing Act; And To Amend The Law Concerning Foster Homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Definition Of "foster Home" Under The Child Welfare Agency Licensing Act; And To Amend The Law Concerning Foster Homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseNotification that HB1469 is now Act 663
2019-04-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-01HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-03-29HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-03-27HouseRe-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-27HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-27SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-26SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-25SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback