AR HB1468 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1468 is now Act 542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Given Name Act; And To Prohibit Requiring Employees Of Public Schools And State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education To Use A Person's Preferred Pronoun, Name, Or Title Without Parental Consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Given Name Act; And To Prohibit Requiring Employees Of Public Schools And State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education To Use A Person's Preferred Pronoun, Name, Or Title Without Parental Consent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 18 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11HouseNotification that HB1468 is now Act 542
2023-04-06HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-04-05SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-04-05SenateSounding of the Ballot. Five hands were seen.
2023-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-29SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-03-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-03-27SenateReceived from the House.
2023-03-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-15HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2023-03-13HouseRe-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-03-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-07HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-02-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1468&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1468.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1468%2FHB1468030720230922.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1468%2FHB1468031520231022.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=542.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1468-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1468-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1468&rcs=620&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1468&rcs=950&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback