AR HB1468 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1468 is now Act 754
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that HB1468 is now Act 754
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Public School Choice.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Public School Choice.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1468 is now Act 754 |
2019-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |