AR HB1468 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Notification that HB1468 is now Act 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Notification that HB1468 is now Act 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Modify The Use Of Shared Leave Under The Uniform Attendance And Leave Policy Act.
Title
To Modify The Use Of Shared Leave Under The Uniform Attendance And Leave Policy Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Notification that HB1468 is now Act 389 |
2015-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |