AR HB1461 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1461 is now Act 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1461 is now Act 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Expand The Number Of Private Schools Eligible To Participate In The Succeed Scholarship Program; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Expand The Number Of Private Schools Eligible To Participate In The Succeed Scholarship Program; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1461 is now Act 327 |
2017-02-24 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The vote by which the emergency clause FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-17 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |