AR HB1460 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Notification that HB1460 is now Act 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Notification that HB1460 is now Act 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 Regarding Employee Protections And Employee Safety.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 Regarding Employee Protections And Employee Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Notification that HB1460 is now Act 593 |
2017-03-17 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-01 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2017-02-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-28 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |