AR HB1457 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that HB1457 is now Act 935
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create Paisley's Law; To Amend The Individual Income Tax Laws; And To Create An Income Tax Credit For A Stillborn Child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create Paisley's Law; To Amend The Individual Income Tax Laws; And To Create An Income Tax Credit For A Stillborn Child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseNotification that HB1457 is now Act 935
2021-04-20HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-19HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-19SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2021-03-01SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-02-25HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback