AR HB1456 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1456 is now Act 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1456 is now Act 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating The Fentanyl Enforcement And Accountability Act Of 2023; Concerning Fentanyl And Other Controlled Substances; To Establish Increased Penalties; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Creating The Fentanyl Enforcement And Accountability Act Of 2023; Concerning Fentanyl And Other Controlled Substances; To Establish Increased Penalties; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R] | Sen. Ben Gilmore [R] | Rep. Howard Beaty [R] | Rep. Mark Berry [R] |
Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R] | Rep. John Maddox [R] | Rep. Stan Berry [R] | Rep. Cameron Cooper [R] |
Rep. Jon Eubanks [R] | Rep. Justin Gonzales [R] | Rep. Delia Haak [R] | Rep. Steve Hollowell [R] |
Rep. Wayne Long [R] | Rep. Julie Mayberry [R] | Rep. Stephen Meeks [R] | Rep. Jeremiah Moore [R] |
Rep. David Ray [R] | Rep. Marcus Richmond [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] | Rep. Danny Watson [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Wooldridge [R] | Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] | Rep. Jill Bryant [R] |
Sen. Steve Crowell [R] | Sen. Breanne Davis [R] | Sen. Tyler Dees [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Sen. Jane English [R] | Sen. Scott Flippo [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Sen. Ricky Hill [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] |
Sen. Bryan King [R] | Sen. Matt McKee [R] | Sen. John Payton [R] | Sen. Clint Penzo [R] |
Sen. Jim Petty [R] | Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Sen. Matt Stone [R] | Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Notification that HB1456 is now Act 584 |
2023-04-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-04 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed |