AR HB1451 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that HB1451 is now Act 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow A Public School District Or An Open-enrollment Public Charter School To Adopt An Approved Bilingual Program Or Dual-immersion Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow A Public School District Or An Open-enrollment Public Charter School To Adopt An Approved Bilingual Program Or Dual-immersion Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 20 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseNotification that HB1451 is now Act 663
2021-04-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-07HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2021-04-06HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2021-04-01HouseRe-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-01HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-04-01SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2021-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-31SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-31SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-29SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-03-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-16SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2021-03-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1451&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1451/HB1451020820211607.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1451/HB1451030820211115.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1451/HB1451031520211013.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1451/HB1451033120211334.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=663.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1451-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1451-H2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1451-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1451&rcs=2359&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1451&rcs=2563&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1451&rcs=2708&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback