AR HB1450 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - House Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - House Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
The Arkansas Carbon Dioxide Storage Act.
Title
The Arkansas Carbon Dioxide Storage Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Notice of Reconsideration given. (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | House Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-30 | House WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned to the House as Failed and recommended for study in the interim committee on Insurance | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Notice of Reconsideration given. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and failed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-24 | House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED | |
2011-03-24 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-23 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-17 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-17 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-17 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-15 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-15 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-02-21 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-21 | House Filed |