AR HB1448 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1448 is now Act 782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Motor Carriers; And To Clarify A Driver's Worker Status In Certain Situations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Motor Carriers; And To Clarify A Driver's Worker Status In Certain Situations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseNotification that HB1448 is now Act 782
2019-04-04HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-03HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-03SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-03-18SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback