AR HB1446 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that HB1446 is now Act 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that HB1446 is now Act 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Children Of Members Of The Uniformed Services Eligible To Receive A Scholarship Under The Succeed Scholarship Program.
Title
To Make Children Of Members Of The Uniformed Services Eligible To Receive A Scholarship Under The Succeed Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
Rep. David Ray [R] | Sen. Jane English [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Notification that HB1446 is now Act 689 |
2021-04-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |