AR HB1445 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1445 is now Act 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish Cost-reporting For Assisted Living Facilities To The Department Of Human Services As A Condition Of Participation In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish Cost-reporting For Assisted Living Facilities To The Department Of Human Services As A Condition Of Participation In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06HouseNotification that HB1445 is now Act 198
2023-03-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-02HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-03-02SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-03-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-27SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-23HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-22HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-22HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-22HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-02-16HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback