AR HB1442 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1442 is now Act 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Personal Finance And Job Readiness Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Personal Finance And Job Readiness Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16HouseNotification that HB1442 is now Act 480
2017-03-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-08HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-08HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-03-06HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-03-06SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-02SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-03-01SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-02-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2017-02-23SenateReceived from the House.
2017-02-23HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-10HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-02-10HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-03HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback