AR HB1435 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Notification that HB1435 is now Act 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Notification that HB1435 is now Act 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Public Schools And Open-enrollment Charter Schools To Post The Child Abuse Hotline Telephone Number.
Title
To Require Public Schools And Open-enrollment Charter Schools To Post The Child Abuse Hotline Telephone Number.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarke Tucker [D] | Sen. Jim Hendren [I] | Rep. Charles Blake [D] | Rep. Charlotte Douglas [R] |
Rep. Charlene Fite [R] | Rep. Warwick Sabin [D] | Rep. Deann Vaught [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Notification that HB1435 is now Act 379 |
2017-02-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-10 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed |