AR HB1433 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Notification that HB1433 is now Act 380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Modify The Definition Of "public Utility".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Modify The Definition Of "public Utility".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseNotification that HB1433 is now Act 380
2015-03-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-03-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-03-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-03-09SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-04SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2015-03-04SenateReceived from the House.
2015-03-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-02-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
2015-02-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback