AR HB1433 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1433 is now Act 265
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Community Correction General Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Community Correction General Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-01HouseNotification that HB1433 is now Act 265
2013-02-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-02-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-02-28HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2013-02-28SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2013-02-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-02-28SenateRules suspended.
2013-02-28SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-02-27SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2013-02-27SenateReceived from the House.
2013-02-27HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-02-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-02-27HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-02-27HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2013-02-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-02-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2013-02-21HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback