AR HB1433 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - House Notification that HB1433 is now Act 739
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish Performance Ratings For Education Service Cooperatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish Performance Ratings For Education Service Cooperatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-23 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 House Notification that HB1433 is now Act 739
2011-03-24 House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2011-03-23 House TO BE ENROLLED
2011-03-23 House Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2011-03-22 House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2011-03-21 House Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2011-03-21 House Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2011-03-21 Senate Returned To the House as passed as amended.
2011-03-21 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2011-03-16 Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2011-03-07 Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
2011-03-07 Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2011-03-07 Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2011-03-07 Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2011-03-02 Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2011-03-02 Senate Received from the House.
2011-03-02 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2011-03-01 House Returned by the Committee Do Pass
2011-02-16 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2011-02-16 House Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback