AR HB1431 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that HB1431 is now Act 517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that HB1431 is now Act 517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Administrative Rules.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Administrative Rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Notification that HB1431 is now Act 517 |
2019-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-14 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-03-12 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |