AR HB1429 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of A Driver's License To Certain Applicants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Issuance Of A Driver's License To Certain Applicants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 49 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseDied in the House at Sine Die Adjournment
2023-03-15HouseRead the third time and failed.
2023-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-08HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-07HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-22HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-22HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-22HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2023-02-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1429&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1429.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1429%2FHB1429022220231029.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1429%2FHB1429030720230928.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1429%2FHB1429030820230944.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1429-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1429-H2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1429-H3.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FHB1429-DFA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FHB1429-DFA2.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FHB1429-DFA3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1429&rcs=537&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback