AR HB1425 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Notification that HB1425 is now Act 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Human Trafficking Prevention Training For The Issuance Of A Class A Commercial Driver License.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Human Trafficking Prevention Training For The Issuance Of A Class A Commercial Driver License.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseNotification that HB1425 is now Act 366
2019-03-06HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-05SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-02-25SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback