AR HB1419 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Notification that HB1419 is now Act 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Notification that HB1419 is now Act 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Ensuring Access For All Arkansans And Voter Protection Act Of 2023; To Amend The Procedure For The Filing Of A Ballot Initiative And Referendum Petition; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Create The Ensuring Access For All Arkansans And Voter Protection Act Of 2023; To Amend The Procedure For The Filing Of A Ballot Initiative And Referendum Petition; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - The Emergency Clause of HB1419 was adopted. (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Notification that HB1419 is now Act 236 |
2023-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | The Emergency Clause of HB1419 was adopted. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which the Emergency Clause failed of adoption. Motion Carried. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-22 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed |