AR HB1418 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Notification that HB1418 is now Act 871
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Notification that HB1418 is now Act 871
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Maximum Height Of A Motor Vehicle Authorized To Operate On A State Highway.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Maximum Height Of A Motor Vehicle Authorized To Operate On A State Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Beck [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Notification that HB1418 is now Act 871 |
2021-04-21 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-20 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |