AR HB1417 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1417 is now Act 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1417 is now Act 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 To Protect The Identity Of Certain Persons Assisting In Criminal Investigations; And To Create An Exemption To The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967.
Title
To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 To Protect The Identity Of Certain Persons Assisting In Criminal Investigations; And To Create An Exemption To The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Notification that HB1417 is now Act 1012 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-10 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2019-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |