AR HB1411 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that HB1411 is now Act 654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that HB1411 is now Act 654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Definition Of "motor Vehicle" Under The Omnibus Dwi Or Bwi Act; And Concerning A Test For Blood Alcohol Content When A Motor Vehicle Or Boating Accident Occurs.
Title
Concerning The Definition Of "motor Vehicle" Under The Omnibus Dwi Or Bwi Act; And Concerning A Test For Blood Alcohol Content When A Motor Vehicle Or Boating Accident Occurs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Notification that HB1411 is now Act 654 |
2019-04-01 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-29 | House | Senate amendment # 1 & 2 read and concurred in. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2 |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hold in the Chamber |
2019-03-04 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by Which HB1411 Failed. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |