AR HB1410 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Obligations Of Residential Landlords And Residential Tenants; And To Require Minimum Habitability Standards For Tenants Of Residential Real Property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Obligations Of Residential Landlords And Residential Tenants; And To Require Minimum Habitability Standards For Tenants Of Residential Real Property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-03-11HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-11HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-11HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback