AR HB1410 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Notification that HB1410 is now Act 328
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Notification that HB1410 is now Act 328
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Authority For Arkansas Public Schools To Offer American Sign Language As A Credit-bearing Modern Language Or Foreign Language.
Title
To Provide Authority For Arkansas Public Schools To Offer American Sign Language As A Credit-bearing Modern Language Or Foreign Language.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Mayberry [R] | Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Notification that HB1410 is now Act 328 |
2013-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |