AR HB1407 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that HB1407 is now Act 441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Voter Registration And Secure Voter Records Act Of 2023; To Amend Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 51; And To Amend The Duties Of The Secretary Of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Voter Registration And Secure Voter Records Act Of 2023; To Amend Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 51; And To Amend The Duties Of The Secretary Of State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04HouseNotification that HB1407 is now Act 441
2023-03-31HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-30HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-30HouseSenate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
2023-03-30HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2023-03-29HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2
2023-03-27HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2023-03-27HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
2023-03-27SenateReturned To the House as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
2023-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-16SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-16SenateAmendment # 1 & 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-03-16SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 & 2
2023-02-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2023-02-21SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2023-02-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1407&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1407.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1407%2FHB1407031620231201.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=441.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1407-S1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1407-S2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1407&rcs=291&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1407&rcs=587&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1407&rcs=717&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1407&rcs=718&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback