AR HB1407 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Notification that HB1407 is now Act 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Notification that HB1407 is now Act 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Regarding Disposition Of Human And Fetal Tissue.
Title
To Amend The Laws Regarding Disposition Of Human And Fetal Tissue.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Notification that HB1407 is now Act 535 |
2015-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-12 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2015-03-09 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 2 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Amendment #1 Withdrawn |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |