AR HB1404 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Notification that HB1404 is now Act 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Notification that HB1404 is now Act 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Election Procedures Concerning Ballot Tabulators.
Title
To Amend Election Procedures Concerning Ballot Tabulators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Notification that HB1404 is now Act 246 |
2023-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed |