AR HB1404 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Notification that HB1404 is now Act 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Notification that HB1404 is now Act 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Regulate Self-service Storage Facilities; To Allow An Operator To Remove Motorized Personal Property If An Occupant Is In Default.
Title
To Regulate Self-service Storage Facilities; To Allow An Operator To Remove Motorized Personal Property If An Occupant Is In Default.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Mcnair [R] | Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Rep. Scott Baltz [D] | Rep. Nate Bell [R] |
Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Rep. David Branscum [R] | Rep. Andy Davis [R] | Rep. Logan Jett [R] |
Rep. J.P. Johnson [D] | Rep. James Ratliff [D] | Rep. John Vines [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1404 is now Act 348 |
2015-03-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-04 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed |